#### Solved Examples and Worksheet for Writing and Interpreting Numerical Expressions

Q1What is the correct interpretation of the expression, 6 × (15478 + 565)?
A. 6 more than (15478 + 565)
B. 6 times as large as (15478 + 565)
C. 6 is equal to (15478 + 565)
D. 6 less than (15478 + 565)

Step: 1
6 × (15478 + 565) is read as ″ 6 multiplied by the sum of 15478 and 565″
Step: 2
In words, ″ 6 multiplied by the sum of 15478 and 565″ can also be expressed as ″ 6 times as large as (15478 + 565)″
Correct Answer is :   6 times as large as (15478 + 565)
Q2Choose the exact interpretation of the expression, 2 × (420000 + 345).
A. 2 is equal to (420000 + 345)
B. 2 more than (420000 + 345)
C. 2 less than (420000 + 345)
D. 2 times as large as (420000 + 345)

Step: 1
″2 × (420000 + 345) is read as ″ 2 multiplied by the sum of 420000 and 345″.
Step: 2
In words, ″ 2 multiplied by the sum of 420000 and 345″ can also be expressed as ″2 times as large as (420000 + 345)″.
Correct Answer is :   2 times as large as (420000 + 345)
Q3Which of the following is the correct interpretation of 18 × (15497 + 300)?
A. 18 less than (15497 + 300)
B. 18 times as large as (15497 + 300)
C. Sum of 15497 and 300 divided by 18
D. 18 more than (15497 + 300)

Step: 1
18 × (15497 + 300) is read as ″ 18 multiplied by the sum of 15497 and 300″.
Step: 2
In words, ″ 18 multiplied by the sum of 15497 and 300″ can also be expressed as ″18 times as large as (15497 + 300)″.
Correct Answer is :   18 times as large as (15497 + 300)
Q4Identify the precise interpretation of 17 × (34978 + 652).
A. 17 more than (34978 + 652)
B. Sum of 34978 and 652 divided by 17
C. 17 times as large as (34978 + 652)
D. 17 less than (34978 + 652)

Step: 1
17 × (34978 + 652) is read as ″17 multiplied by the sum of 34978 and 652″
Step: 2
In words, ″17 multiplied by the sum of 34978 and 652″ can also be expressed as ″17 times as large as (34978 + 652)″.
Correct Answer is :   17 times as large as (34978 + 652)
Q5Identify the suitable numerical expression for the following statement:

"Subtract 14000 from 75000, and then Multiply by 1000."

A. 75000 - 14000 × 1000
B. 1000 × (14000-75000)
C. 14000 - 75000 × 1000
D. 1000 × (75000 - 14000)

Step: 1
"Subtract 14000 from 75,000, then Multiply by 1000 ." Means "1000 multiplied by the difference of 75000 and 14000".
Step: 2
So numerically we express the given statement as: 1000 × (75000 - 14000)
Correct Answer is :   1000 × (75000 - 14000)
Q6What is the exact interpretation of the expression, 9 × (15431 + 421)?
A. 9 times as large as (15431 + 421)
B. 9 is equal to (15431 + 421)
C. 9 more than (15431 + 421)
D. 9 less than (15431 + 421)

Step: 1
9 × (15431 + 421) is read as ″9 multiplied by the sum of 15431 and 421″
Step: 2
In words, ″9 multiplied by the sum of 15431 and 421″ can also be expressed as ″9 times as large as (15431 + 421)″.
Correct Answer is :   9 times as large as (15431 + 421)
Q7Which of the following choices is the correct interpretation of ″3 × (17451 + 542)″?
A. 3 more than (17451 + 542)
B. Sum of 17451 and 542 divided by 3
C. 3 less than (17451 + 542)
D. 3 times as large as (17451 + 542)

Step: 1
3 × (17451 + 542) is read as "3 multiplied by the sum of 17451 and 542"
Step: 2
In words, "3 multiplied by the sum of 17451 and 542" can also be expressed as "3 times as large as (17451 + 542)".
Correct Answer is :   3 times as large as (17451 + 542)
Q8Identify the proper interpretation of 20 × (64215 + 253).
A. 20 times as large as (64215 + 253)
B. 20 more than (64215 + 253)
C. 20 less than ( 64215 + 253)
D. Sum of 64215 and 253 divided by 20

Step: 1
20 × (64215 + 253) is read as "20 multiplied by the sum of 64215 and 253".
Step: 2
In words, "20 multiplied by the sum of 64215 and 253" can also be expressed as "20 times as large as (64215 + 253)".
Correct Answer is :   20 times as large as (64215 + 253)
Q9Identify the suitable numerical expression for the statement "Add 12568 and 142, then Multiply by 33''.

A. 33 × 142 + 12568
B. 142 + 12568 × 33
C. 12568 + 142 × 33
D. 33 × (12568 + 142)

Step: 1
"Add 12568 and 142, then Multiply by 33" means "33 multiplied by the sum of 12568 and 142".
Step: 2
So numerically we express the given statement as: 33 × (12568 + 142).
Correct Answer is :   33 × (12568 + 142)
Q10Choose the numerical expression that is equivalent to the following statement, "Subtract 212 from 1500, then Multiply by 15."
A. 1500 - 212 × 15
B. 212 - 1500 × 15
C. 15 × (1500 - 212)
D. (212 - 1500) × 15

Step: 1
"Subtract 212 from 1500, then Multiply by 15" means "15 multiplied by the difference of 1500 and 212".
Step: 2
So, numerically we express the given statement as: 15 × (1500 - 212).
Correct Answer is :    15 × (1500 - 212)
Q11Which of the following is the missing information for the given expression and its equivalent form, "Add 23145 and 450, then Multiply by 5" = 5 × (______).

A. 5 × 450 + 23145
B. 23145 + 450
C. 450 + 23145 × 5
D. 23145 + 450 × 5

Step: 1
"Add 23145 and 450, then Multiply by 5." means "5 multiplied by the sum of 23145 and 450".
Step: 2
Numerically we express the given statement as: 5 × (23145 + 450).
Step: 3
So the missing part is 23145 + 450.
Correct Answer is :   23145 + 450
Q12Which of the following is the missing information for the given expression and its equivalent form, "Add 46827 and 159, then Multiply by 9" = ____ × (46827 + 159 )?

A. 9
B. 4
C. 59
D. 27

Step: 1
"Add 46827 and 159, then Multiply by 9" means "9 multiplied by the sum of 46827 and 159".
Step: 2
Numerically we express the given statement as: 9 × (46827 + 159).
Step: 3
So the missing part is 9.
Q13Which of the following is the missing information for the given expression and its equivalent form, "Add 22236 and 757, then Multiply by 3" = ____ × (22236 + 757 )?
A. 6
B. 3
C. 4
D. 5

Step: 1
"Add 22236 and 757, then Multiply by 3" means "3 multiplied by the sum of 22236 and 757".
Step: 2
Numerically we express the given statement as: 3× (22236 + 757).
Step: 3
So the missing part is 3 and hence 3 is the correct choice.
Q14Which of the following is the missing information for the given expression and its equivalent form, "Add 25874 and 651 , then Multiply by 19" = 19 × ( ______ )

A. 25874 x 651
B. 25874 / 651
C. 25874 - 651
D. 25874 + 651

Step: 1
"Add 25874 and 651, then Multiply by 19" means "19 multiplied by the sum of 25874 and 651".
Step: 2
Numerically we express the given statement as: 19 × (25874 + 651).
Step: 3
So the missing part is 25874 + 651.
Correct Answer is :   25874 + 651