#### Solved Examples and Worksheet for Multiplying Whole Numbers

Q1Find the product of 416 and 23.

A. 8568
B. 9568
C. 9668
D. 8668

Step: 1
416 × 23
[Original expression.]
Step: 2
 416 × 23 1248 + 832 9568

[Multiply by 3.]

[Multiply by 2.]

Step: 3
The product of 416 and 23 is 9568.
Q2Multiply 300 by 33.

A. 8900
B. 9800
C. 9900
D. 9990

Step: 1
300 × 33
[Original expression.]
Step: 2
 300 × 33 900 + 900 9900

[Multiply by 3.]
[Multiply by 3.]

Step: 3
The product of 300 and 33 is 9900.
Q3Multiply 864 by 63.

A. 54,332
B. 50,032
C. 54,000
D. 54,432

Step: 1
864 × 63
[Original expression.]
Step: 2

 TTh Th H T O 8 6 4 × 6 3 2 5 9 2 5 1 8 4 5 4 4 3 2

[Multiply by 3.]
[Multiply by 6.]

Q4Find the product of 5755 and 9.
A. 51,005
B. 50,705
C. 51,795
D. 51,000

Step: 1
The product of 5755 and 9 is 5755 × 9
[Original expression.]
Step: 2

 TTh Th H T O 5 7 5 5 × 9 5 1 7 9 5

[Multiply by 9.]
Q5Find the product of 60 and 400.

A. 240000
B. 2400
C. 24000
D. 2400000

Step: 1
60 = 6 × 10
Step: 2
400 = 4 × 100
Step: 3
60 × 400 = (6 × 10) × (4 × 100) = 24000
Q6Multiply:

 8 6 4 ×    5 3 _____

A. 40,092
B. 45,792
C. 47,592
D. 45,000

Step: 1
Multiply by ones. Step: 2
Multiply by tens. Step: 3 Step: 4
Q7Choose a figure that completes the product.
 7 0 6 × 6 ¢ ¢ ¢ 6 A. Figure 2
B. Figure 3
C. Figure 1

Step: 1 Step: 2
Therefore, the figure that completes the product is Figure 1.
Correct Answer is :   Figure 1
Q8Find the product of 6,400 × 2.
A. 12,800
B. 1,280
C. 12,500

Step: 1
64 × 2 = 128
[Multiply.]
Step: 2
So, 6,400 × 2 = 12,800.
[Since there are 2 zeroes at the end of 64 put 2 zeroes at the end of 128.]
Q9Choose a figure that completes the product.
 3 7 × 5 5 A. Figure 3
B. Figure 1
C. Figure 2

Step: 1 Step: 2
Therefore, the figure that completes the product is Figure 1.
Correct Answer is :   Figure 1
Q10Multiply:
 3 5 × 1 8

A. 630
B. 370
C. 350
D. 540

Step: 1
 3 5 × 1 8 2 8 0 ←35 ×  8 + 3 5 0 ←35 ×  10 6 3 0
Step: 2
35 × 18 = 630
Q11Complete the product.
 8 5 × 2 2

A. 1,870
B. 1,807
C. 1,087
D. 1,780

Step: 1
 8 5 × 2 2 1 7 0 ← 85 ×  2 + 1 7 0 0 ← 85  × 20 1 8 7 0 